|
03/01/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
02/23/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Amendment 698496 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 9
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (698496)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Fiscal Policy (698496); YEAS 14 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 119, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Amendment 355757 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/23/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|