Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1377 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill January 23, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 14, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 18, 2024