Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024