Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1407 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024