House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Reported out of Select Committee on Health Innovation | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Favorable by Select Committee on Health Innovation | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Added to Select Committee on Health Innovation agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/06/2024 | Filed |