House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/06/2024 | Filed |