House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|