Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1459 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024