House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|