Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1469 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024