LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H1491
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H1491
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H1491
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 8, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 6, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 6, 2024
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
May 1, 2024
Analysis
March 13, 2024
Analysis
February 13, 2024
Analysis
January 17, 2024
Analysis
January 14, 2024
Analysis
January 11, 2024
Analysis
January 9, 2024
Comm Sub
Bill
January 18, 2024
Compare
Bill
January 11, 2024
Compare