House
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 7018
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Substituted SB 7018
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|