Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024