Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 109, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 619985 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Original reference removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|