Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 6, 2024