House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Filed |