|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-181
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 565294 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (565294)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1188
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|