House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|