Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024