House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Now in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Filed |