Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1609 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024