House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|