Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1613 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024