House | 03/05/2024 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Original reference removed: Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Filed |