|
05/16/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-186
|
|
|
|
05/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/30/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 81, NAYS 29
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 282208 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (282208)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1624
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 88, NAYS 19
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 522597 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 353313 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 794403 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|