Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1645 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 17, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 18, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024