03/22/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-37 | |||
03/22/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
03/19/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 02/08/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Substituted for SB 2506 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Received | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | In Messages | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/7/2024) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Filed |