Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill February 9, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024