05/17/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-194; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2024-231) | |||
05/16/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
05/07/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 03/08/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Conference Committee Report adopted (154757) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Conference Committee Report received | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | In returning messages | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 109, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Conference Committee Report adopted | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Amendment 154757 adopted | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Conference Committee Report considered | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Added to Conference Report Calendar | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Broxson (Chair), Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Brodeur (Chair), Berman, Boyd, Garcia, Grall, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Trumbull, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/State Administration and Technology: Brodeur (Chair), Berman, Boyd, Garcia, Grall, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Trumbull, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Criminal And Civil Justice/Justice: Bradley (Chair), Baxley, Burgess, Hooper, Martin, Pizzo, Powell, Rouson, Torres, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Education/Higher Education: Perry (Chair), Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Education/PreK-12: Perry (Chair), Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Health And Human Services/Health Care: Harrell (Chair), Avila, Baxley, Book, Brodeur, Burgess, Burton, Davis, Garcia, Gruters, Rouson, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Transportation, Tourism, And Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Hooper (Chair), DiCeglie, Stewart, Thompson, Trumbull, Wright, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Conference Committee appointed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | The Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Amendment(s) adopted (921790) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Substituted for SB 2514 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Received | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/7/2024) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Filed |