Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024