Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6019 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 HB 6019 2024
44
55
66
77
88 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
99 hb6019-00
1010
1111 Page 1 of 5
1212 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
1313
1414
1515
1616 A bill to be entitled 1
1717 An act for the relief of J.N., a minor, by 2
1818 Hillsborough County; providing an appropriation to 3
1919 Stephany Grullon, as parent and guardian of J.N., to 4
2020 compensate J.N. for injuries and damages sustained as 5
2121 a result of the negligence of Hillsborough County in 6
2222 maintaining sidewalk repairs; providing a limitation 7
2323 on the payment of attorney fees; providing an 8
2424 effective date. 9
2525 10
2626 WHEREAS, on June 7, 2019, in the afternoon, J.N., an 11 -11
2727 year-old child at the time, was riding her bicycle, accompanied 12
2828 by her mother's fiancé, Gabriel Soto, on a sidewalk located 13
2929 along the east side of East Bay Road and adjacent to the East 14
3030 Bay Lakes subdivision in Gibsonton, and 15
3131 WHEREAS, the sidewalk is owned and maintained by 16
3232 Hillsborough County, and 17
3333 WHEREAS, J.N. was wearing her helmet while riding her 18
3434 bicycle when her bicycle wheel hit an uneven area of the 19
3535 concrete slab sidewalk causing her to lose control of her 20
3636 bicycle and tumble down a steep slope next to the sidewalk, and 21
3737 WHEREAS, by careening face forward over the handlebars into 22
3838 a concrete and metal corrugated drainage culvert pipe, J.N. 23
3939 lacerated portions of her gums, fractured her jaw, and avulsed 24
4040
4141 HB 6019 2024
4242
4343
4444
4545
4646 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
4747 hb6019-00
4848
4949 Page 2 of 5
5050 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
5151
5252
5353
5454 multiple adult teeth, and 25
5555 WHEREAS, J.N. was rushed to the emergency room at St. 26
5656 Joseph's Hospital where she underwent a CT scan which revealed a 27
5757 fracture of the nasal bone, fracture of the maxilla, and fracture 28
5858 of the superior alveolus, and 29
5959 WHEREAS, the severity of the injur ies required plastic 30
6060 surgery intervention and on June 8, 2019, J.N. underwent a 31
6161 surgical procedure consisting of exploration and removal of 32
6262 the impacted gingiva into her nasal structures and into the 33
6363 upper maxilla, repair of the midline laceration of the upper 34
6464 lip, and repair of the gingiva and lower lip vermilion, and 35
6565 WHEREAS, on June 14, 2019, J.N. underwent a second surgery 36
6666 consisting of a closed reduction of her nasal fracture, and 37
6767 WHEREAS, on February 20, 2021, J.N. was seen by Pediatric 38
6868 Epilepsy and Neurology Specialists due to headaches that she 39
6969 experienced as frequently as once or twice a week and which had 40
7070 first started shortly after the accident, and 41
7171 WHEREAS, on March 16, 2022, J.N. was seen by an oral 42
7272 surgeon at the Moffett Oral Surgery and Dental Implant 43
7373 Center, during which time she was informed that she would 44
7474 need a bone graft and eventually an implant, and 45
7575 WHEREAS, J.N. has to wait for her bones to finish growing 46
7676 before Dr. Moffett can proceed with the bone graft, which he 47
7777 expects will be when J.N. is 16 or 17 years old, and 48
7878
7979 HB 6019 2024
8080
8181
8282
8383
8484 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
8585 hb6019-00
8686
8787 Page 3 of 5
8888 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
8989
9090
9191
9292 WHEREAS, after J.N. heals from her bone graft, Moffett Oral 49
9393 Surgery and Dental Implant Center will then start the process 50
9494 for implants and eventually crowns, and 51
9595 WHEREAS, along with the medical treatment and bills 52
9696 associated with this injury, J.N. has suffered intangible and 53
9797 emotional losses, has an extreme loss of self -esteem, and 54
9898 struggles socially with her peers, and 55
9999 WHEREAS, the county was on notice that the same section 56
100100 of sidewalk where J.N. had her accident was in need of repair 57
101101 and replacement as early as October 7, 2015, by way of a work 58
102102 request order which had been received, and 59
103103 WHEREAS, in 2016, Juan Olivero Lopez, a Hillsborough 60
104104 County maintenance supervisor responsible for sidewalk 61
105105 maintenance, stated that he was directed by the county to 62
106106 inspect the sidewalk, and 63
107107 WHEREAS, Juan Olivero Lopez further stated that in 64
108108 response to the work order, the South Service Unit performed a 65
109109 physical inspection of the sidewalk before the date of the 66
110110 accident, but that repairs to make the sidewalk safe were 67
111111 never performed, and 68
112112 WHEREAS, the drainage ditch and culvert system located next 69
113113 to the sidewalk were also in need of maintenance and repair, as 70
114114 evidenced by the extensive deterioration of the concrete and 71
115115 metal corrugated drainage culvert pipe which had become jagged 72
116116
117117 HB 6019 2024
118118
119119
120120
121121
122122 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
123123 hb6019-00
124124
125125 Page 4 of 5
126126 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
127127
128128
129129
130130 and rusted, and 73
131131 WHEREAS, Hillsborough County employee, William Cox, a civil 74
132132 engineer responsible for drainage culvert replacement and 75
133133 planning, stated that he was not responsible for the maint enance 76
134134 of the culvert, and 77
135135 WHEREAS, Juan Olivero Lopez, as a maintenance supervisor of 78
136136 the South Service Unit, stated that he was also not responsible 79
137137 for the maintenance of the culvert, and 80
138138 WHEREAS, clearly there was a gap in maintenance 81
139139 responsibility for the culvert, which was never repaired and 82
140140 which contributed to the severity of J.N.'s injuries, and 83
141141 WHEREAS, Stephany Grullon and Hillsborough County entered 84
142142 into a settlement and release agreement on September 20, 85
143143 2022, in which the county agreed to pay Stephany Grullon 86
144144 $600,000 to settle all claims, and 87
145145 WHEREAS, Hillsborough County paid $200,000, the sovereign 88
146146 immunity limit under s. 768.28, Florida Statutes, to Stephany 89
147147 Grullon within 20 days after entering into the settlement 90
148148 agreement, and 91
149149 WHEREAS, Hillsborough County acknowledged and agreed not 92
150150 to oppose a legislative claims bill that would be filed 93
151151 during the 2023 Regular Session of the Legislature or in a 94
152152 subsequent legislative session for the additional $400,000, 95
153153 and 96
154154
155155 HB 6019 2024
156156
157157
158158
159159
160160 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions.
161161 hb6019-00
162162
163163 Page 5 of 5
164164 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S
165165
166166
167167
168168 WHEREAS, the statutory l imit under s. 768.28, Florida 97
169169 Statutes, paid to Stephany Grullon is $200,000, but the 98
170170 balance of $400,000 remains unpaid, NOW, THEREFORE, 99
171171 100
172172 Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 101
173173 102
174174 Section 1. The facts stated in the preamble to this act 103
175175 are found and declared to be true. 104
176176 Section 2. Hillsborough County is authorized and directed 105
177177 to appropriate from funds of the county not otherwise encumbered 106
178178 and draw a warrant in the sum of $400,000 payable to Stephany 107
179179 Grullon, as parent and guard ian of J.N., to be placed in a trust 108
180180 created for the exclusive use and benefit of J.N. for injuries 109
181181 and damages sustained. 110
182182 Section 3. The amount awarded under this act is intended 111
183183 to provide the sole compensation for all present and future 112
184184 claims arising out of the factual situation described in this 113
185185 act which resulted in injuries and damages to J.N. The total 114
186186 amount paid for attorney fees and costs, lobbying fees, and 115
187187 other similar expenses relating to this claim may not exceed 25 116
188188 percent of the total amount awarded under this act. 117
189189 Section 4. This act shall take effect upon becoming a law. 118