Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6019 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2024

                               
 
HB 6019  	2024 
 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6019-00 
 
Page 1 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act for the relief of J.N., a minor, by 2 
Hillsborough County; providing an appropriation to 3 
Stephany Grullon, as parent and guardian of J.N., to 4 
compensate J.N. for injuries and damages sustained as 5 
a result of the negligence of Hillsborough County in 6 
maintaining sidewalk repairs; providing a limitation 7 
on the payment of attorney fees; providing an 8 
effective date. 9 
 10 
 WHEREAS, on June 7, 2019, in the afternoon, J.N., an 11 -11 
year-old child at the time, was riding her bicycle, accompanied 12 
by her mother's fiancé, Gabriel Soto, on a sidewalk located 13 
along the east side of East Bay Road and adjacent to the East 14 
Bay Lakes subdivision in Gibsonton, and 15 
 WHEREAS, the sidewalk is owned and maintained by 16 
Hillsborough County, and 17 
 WHEREAS, J.N. was wearing her helmet while riding her 18 
bicycle when her bicycle wheel hit an uneven area of the 19 
concrete slab sidewalk causing her to lose control of her 20 
bicycle and tumble down a steep slope next to the sidewalk, and 21 
 WHEREAS, by careening face forward over the handlebars into 22 
a concrete and metal corrugated drainage culvert pipe, J.N. 23 
lacerated portions of her gums, fractured her jaw, and avulsed 24     
 
HB 6019  	2024 
 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6019-00 
 
Page 2 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
multiple adult teeth, and 25 
 WHEREAS, J.N. was rushed to the emergency room at St. 26 
Joseph's Hospital where she underwent a CT scan which revealed a 27 
fracture of the nasal bone, fracture of the maxilla, and fracture 28 
of the superior alveolus, and 29 
 WHEREAS, the severity of the injur ies required plastic 30 
surgery intervention and on June 8, 2019, J.N. underwent a 31 
surgical procedure consisting of exploration and removal of 32 
the impacted gingiva into her nasal structures and into the 33 
upper maxilla, repair of the midline laceration of the upper 34 
lip, and repair of the gingiva and lower lip vermilion, and 35 
 WHEREAS, on June 14, 2019, J.N. underwent a second surgery 36 
consisting of a closed reduction of her nasal fracture, and 37 
 WHEREAS, on February 20, 2021, J.N. was seen by Pediatric 38 
Epilepsy and Neurology Specialists due to headaches that she 39 
experienced as frequently as once or twice a week and which had 40 
first started shortly after the accident, and 41 
 WHEREAS, on March 16, 2022, J.N. was seen by an oral 42 
surgeon at the Moffett Oral Surgery and Dental Implant 43 
Center, during which time she was informed that she would 44 
need a bone graft and eventually an implant, and 45 
 WHEREAS, J.N. has to wait for her bones to finish growing 46 
before Dr. Moffett can proceed with the bone graft, which he 47 
expects will be when J.N. is 16 or 17 years old, and 48     
 
HB 6019  	2024 
 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6019-00 
 
Page 3 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 WHEREAS, after J.N. heals from her bone graft, Moffett Oral 49 
Surgery and Dental Implant Center will then start the process 50 
for implants and eventually crowns, and 51 
 WHEREAS, along with the medical treatment and bills 52 
associated with this injury, J.N. has suffered intangible and 53 
emotional losses, has an extreme loss of self -esteem, and 54 
struggles socially with her peers, and 55 
 WHEREAS, the county was on notice that the same section 56 
of sidewalk where J.N. had her accident was in need of repair 57 
and replacement as early as October 7, 2015, by way of a work 58 
request order which had been received, and 59 
 WHEREAS, in 2016, Juan Olivero Lopez, a Hillsborough 60 
County maintenance supervisor responsible for sidewalk 61 
maintenance, stated that he was directed by the county to 62 
inspect the sidewalk, and 63 
 WHEREAS, Juan Olivero Lopez further stated that in 64 
response to the work order, the South Service Unit performed a 65 
physical inspection of the sidewalk before the date of the 66 
accident, but that repairs to make the sidewalk safe were 67 
never performed, and 68 
 WHEREAS, the drainage ditch and culvert system located next 69 
to the sidewalk were also in need of maintenance and repair, as 70 
evidenced by the extensive deterioration of the concrete and 71 
metal corrugated drainage culvert pipe which had become jagged 72     
 
HB 6019  	2024 
 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6019-00 
 
Page 4 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
and rusted, and 73 
 WHEREAS, Hillsborough County employee, William Cox, a civil 74 
engineer responsible for drainage culvert replacement and 75 
planning, stated that he was not responsible for the maint enance 76 
of the culvert, and 77 
 WHEREAS, Juan Olivero Lopez, as a maintenance supervisor of 78 
the South Service Unit, stated that he was also not responsible 79 
for the maintenance of the culvert, and 80 
 WHEREAS, clearly there was a gap in maintenance 81 
responsibility for the culvert, which was never repaired and 82 
which contributed to the severity of J.N.'s injuries, and 83 
 WHEREAS, Stephany Grullon and Hillsborough County entered 84 
into a settlement and release agreement on September 20, 85 
2022, in which the county agreed to pay Stephany Grullon 86 
$600,000 to settle all claims, and 87 
 WHEREAS, Hillsborough County paid $200,000, the sovereign 88 
immunity limit under s. 768.28, Florida Statutes, to Stephany 89 
Grullon within 20 days after entering into the settlement 90 
agreement, and 91 
 WHEREAS, Hillsborough County acknowledged and agreed not 92 
to oppose a legislative claims bill that would be filed 93 
during the 2023 Regular Session of the Legislature or in a 94 
subsequent legislative session for the additional $400,000, 95 
and 96     
 
HB 6019  	2024 
 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb6019-00 
 
Page 5 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 WHEREAS, the statutory l imit under s. 768.28, Florida 97 
Statutes, paid to Stephany Grullon is $200,000, but the 98 
balance of $400,000 remains unpaid, NOW, THEREFORE, 99 
 100 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 101 
 102 
 Section 1.  The facts stated in the preamble to this act 103 
are found and declared to be true. 104 
 Section 2.  Hillsborough County is authorized and directed 105 
to appropriate from funds of the county not otherwise encumbered 106 
and draw a warrant in the sum of $400,000 payable to Stephany 107 
Grullon, as parent and guard ian of J.N., to be placed in a trust 108 
created for the exclusive use and benefit of J.N. for injuries 109 
and damages sustained. 110 
 Section 3.  The amount awarded under this act is intended 111 
to provide the sole compensation for all present and future 112 
claims arising out of the factual situation described in this 113 
act which resulted in injuries and damages to J.N. The total 114 
amount paid for attorney fees and costs, lobbying fees, and 115 
other similar expenses relating to this claim may not exceed 25 116 
percent of the total amount awarded under this act. 117 
 Section 4.  This act shall take effect upon becoming a law. 118