|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-39
|
|
|
|
03/22/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/19/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment(s) failed (799564, 857160)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 7010
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/23/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|