Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H7019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 25, 2024
Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 23, 2024