Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|