Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H7023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024