House | 02/21/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to SM 1020 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Substituted SM 1020 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024) | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed |