05/16/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-187 | |||
05/15/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
04/30/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 03/04/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Received | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Substituted for SB 7060 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Fiscal Policy | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | In Messages | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024) | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Filed |