Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H7071 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024