|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-183
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Amendment 446004 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (446004)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Amendment(s) reconsidered, withdrawn (930240)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (930240)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1640
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Amendment 262591 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Amendment 709399 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|