Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/20/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|