Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024