Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 241
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 241
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|