Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0056 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024