Senate
|
07/10/2024
|
Veto Message referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2024
|
Veto Message received
|
|
|
|
06/25/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 109, NAYS 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS by Education Postsecondary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|