Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0062 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 28, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024