|
04/09/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-67
|
|
|
|
04/08/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|