Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0066 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024
Analysis December 5, 2023
Analysis December 4, 2023