|
05/20/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-195
|
|
|
|
05/17/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/07/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (642737)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment 642737 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/17/24, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 12/06/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|