Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0092 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis December 6, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023